MA S2500 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 381 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 381 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an arts, culture and tourism promotion fund in the city of New Bedford. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing an arts, culture and tourism promotion fund in the city of New Bedford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 381 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-12-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Montigny) adopted |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Read second |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-10-24 | House | House concurred |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1684 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1041 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1502 (Similar To) 2016-07-15 - New draft substituted, see S2432
S1683 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
S951 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1547 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1846 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S971 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S459 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1453 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S484 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1041 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1502 (Similar To) 2016-07-15 - New draft substituted, see S2432
S1683 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
S951 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1547 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1846 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S971 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S459 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1453 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S484 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2500 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2500.pdf |