MA S249 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2538
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure best practice incentives are available for all school building projects. Education.
Title
Ensuring best practice incentives are available for all school building projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2538 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2479 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1563 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H911 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1984 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1679 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H2834 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S251 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2404 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2426 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1563 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H911 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1984 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1679 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H2834 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S251 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2404 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2426 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S249 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S249.pdf |