MA S2452 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1090
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a center of excellence in community policing and behavioral health,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2452).
Title
To establish a center of excellence in community policing and behavioral health
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-19 | Senate | New draft of S1090 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1090 (Replaces) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2452
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S1212 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1094 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
H2974 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S1212 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1094 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
H2974 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2452 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2452.pdf |