MA S1090 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2452
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a center of excellence in community policing and behavioral health. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To establish a center of excellence in community policing and behavioral health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2452 |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S624 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1095 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
S1212 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1112 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2401 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4356
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S1094 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
H2974 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
H3463 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4363 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
S2452 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1095 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
S1212 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1112 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2401 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4356
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S1094 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
H2974 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
H3463 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4363 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
S2452 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1090 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1090.pdf |