MA S1212 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2422
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to align hospital licensure with community needs in addiction and behavioral health. Public Health.
Title
Aligning hospital licensure with community needs in addiction and behavioral health
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] |
Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2422 |
2017-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1094 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
S555 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S624 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1095 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
S1201 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H2223 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1062 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H1063 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H3226 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4623
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
S555 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S624 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1095 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
S1201 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H2223 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1062 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H601 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H1063 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H3226 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4623
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1212 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1212.pdf |