MA S2441 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to ethics in organ transplants. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to ethics in organ transplants

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-13HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-10SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-01-21JointHearing scheduled for 01/28/2020 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-12-19HouseHouse concurred
2019-10-17SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2019-10-17SenateRules suspended
2019-08-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H2787 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback