CA SB972 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 42655.1 to, and to add and repeal Section 42653.1 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to methane emissions.
Title
Methane emissions: organic waste: landfills.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB972 Min (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB972 Min (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Assembly | July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4208.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3966.) (May 16). |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3753.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42653.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42655.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |