MA H2787 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the powers of the Secretary of the Commonwealth regarding certain ethics laws. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the Secretary of State and ethics reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5103 |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H706 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H649 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H714 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H649 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H714 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2787 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2787.pdf |