MA S2435 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4483
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - See H4483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - See H4483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to job creation, workforce development and infrastructure investment (House, No. 4483) (being the text of Senate, No. 2423, printed as amended)
Title
Relative to job creation, workforce development and infrastructure investment
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Senate | See H4483 |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Text of S2423, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4483 (Replaced by) 2016-07-31 - Reported by H4569
S1418 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2621 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S1463 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2192
H4133 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2016
S1774 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1418 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2621 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S1463 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2192
H4133 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2016
S1774 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2435 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2435.pdf |