MA S243 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2666
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to preventing price gouging during an emergency. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to preventing price gouging during an emergency
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Sheila Harrington [R] |
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2666 |
2021-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1911 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1032 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1754 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H464 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S804 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S450 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2101 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1978 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1032 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1754 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H464 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S804 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S450 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2101 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1978 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S243 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S243.pdf |