MA S2398 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S338
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public health, reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2398).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Public Health to make an investigation and study of a certain current Senate document relative to public health
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Accompanied by S338 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S338 (Replaces) 2018-04-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2398
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2648 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2648 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2398 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2398.pdf |