MA S2377 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 460 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the board of selectmen of the town of Clinton to appoint the Town Treasurer. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the board of selectmen of the town of Clinton to appoint the Town Treasurer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-07 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 460 of the Acts of 2014
2015-01-06SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2015-01-06HouseEnacted
2015-01-05HouseRead second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
2015-01-05HouseRules suspended
2015-01-05HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2014-12-31HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2014-12-31SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2014-12-31SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2014-10-20SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2014-10-06HouseHouse concurred
2014-10-02SenateReferred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback