MA S2353 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Seekonk to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local approval received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Seekonk to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-11-21 | House | Enacted |
2012-11-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-09-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-09-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-09-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-09-04 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-08-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-08-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-08-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-08-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/22/2012 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-2 |
2012-07-19 | House | House concurred |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2353 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119359&generalCourtId=1 |