MA S2320 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the National Guard welcome home veterans' bonus to all deployed members. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Expanding the National Guard welcome home veterans' bonus to all deployed members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2358 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2320 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2320.pdf |