MA S231 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4559
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to sports wagering. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to sports wagering
Sponsors
Sen. James Welch [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4559 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday February 28, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H377 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H378 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H2643 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H368 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5107
S1675 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3849 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2019
H3953 (Similar To) 2020-10-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2020
H4056 (Similar To) 2019-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2019
H4559 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H378 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H2643 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H368 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5107
S1675 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3849 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2019
H3953 (Similar To) 2020-10-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2020
H4056 (Similar To) 2019-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2019
H4559 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S231 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S231.pdf |