MA H4056 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Ryane Lineham, an employee of the Department of Revenue. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Ryane Lineham, an employee of the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-09-23 | House | Enacted |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-09-18 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-09-18 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2019-09-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-09-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-09-12 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-09-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-09-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-09-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-08-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-08-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3849 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4056 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4056.pdf |