MA S2304 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 348 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 348 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorizing the town of Arlington to establish a separate account for proceeds from wireless communications antenna leases. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Arlington to establish a separate account for proceeds from wireless communications antenna leases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 348 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-06 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-11-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-11-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-11-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders |
2012-11-26 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-07-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-06-18 | House | House concurred |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2304 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118835&generalCourtId=1 |