MA S2295 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-06 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-06 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce traffic and encourage shared rides. Transportation.
Title
To reduce congestion and encourage shared rides
Sponsors
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-05 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 29, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1944 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2267 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2753
S2753 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2258 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2267 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2753
S2753 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2258 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2295 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2295.pdf |