MA S2285 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1393
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-10 - Read; and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-10 - Read; and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance, in consultation with the board of trustees of the Essex Independent Agricultural and Technical Institute, to sell and convey a certain parcel of land in the town of Newbury
Title
An Act authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance, in consultation with the board of trustees of the Essex Independent Agricultural and Technical Institute, to sell and convey a certain parcel of land in the town of Newbury
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Read; and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-05-06 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-05-05 | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended | |
2010-05-05 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-02-25 | New draft of S1393 | |
2010-02-25 | Reported from the committee on Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1393 (Replaces) 2010-02-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2285
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s02285.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st02/st02285.htm |