MA S2261 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the licensure of motor vehicle inspection stations (Senate, No. 2139),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft entitled “An Act providing for the licensing of certain motor vehicle inspection stations” (Senate, No. 2261).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the licensure of motor vehicle inspection stations

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-29HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-01-25SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-01-25SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-25SenateSubstituted for S2139
2018-01-18SenateRecommended new text for S2139
2018-01-18SenateReported form the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S2106 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See S2092
S2092 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2103
S2139 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2261
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2303 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2018
S2307 (Similar To) 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2018
H939 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2283 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1860 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback