MA S2673 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding the authorization of the town of Sturbridge to issue an additional license for sale of all alcoholic beverages

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding the authorization of the town of Sturbridge to issue an additional license for sale of all alcoholic beverages

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-12-13HouseRules suspended
2018-12-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-12-10HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-12-06SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-12-06SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-12-03SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-12-03SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2018-11-19JointHearing scheduled for 11/28/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
2018-11-13HouseHouse concurred
2018-11-08SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H3797 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3900
H3900 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2017
S2507 (Similar To) 2018-09-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback