MA S2260 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Townsend to continue the employment of Richard Bailey as police chief. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Townsend to continue the employment of Richard Bailey as police chief
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Tran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-06-19 | House | House concurred |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2356 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2020
S2402 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2020
S2444 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2402 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2020
S2444 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2260 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2260.pdf |