MA S226 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2537
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to fund the foundation budget review commission. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Regarding funding the foundation budget review commission
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2537 |
2019-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S200 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S433 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H970 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1180 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S219 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S335 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S533 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2537 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S200 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S433 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H970 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1180 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S219 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S335 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S533 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2537 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S226 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S226.pdf |