MA H970 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize certain airport commissions to impose taxes or additional requirements on transportation network companies. Financial Services.
Title
Providing for certain fees for airport commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2595 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2601 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
H2560 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2631 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1727 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1703 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H4244 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 357 of the Acts of 2020
S2439 (Similar To) 2020-07-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2601 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
H2560 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2631 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1727 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1703 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H4244 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 357 of the Acts of 2020
S2439 (Similar To) 2020-07-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H970 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H970.pdf |