MA S2255 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to convert the state government fleet to electric vehicles. Transportation.
Title
To convert the state government fleet to electric vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Sen. Michael Brady [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2981 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 29, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2348 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1720 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4504
H1451 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4134 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S194 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3431 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
S2981 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3499 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4617
H3368 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3425 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
H3364 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H1720 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4504
H1451 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4134 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S194 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3431 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
S2981 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3499 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4617
H3368 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3425 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5075
H3364 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2255 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2255.pdf |