MA H1720 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4504
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing penalties for hit and run with a recreational vehicle. The Judiciary.
Title
Increasing penalties for hit and runs with recreational vehicles in the Commonwealth to be known as the James Ward Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] |
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4504 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2523 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H1871 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1842 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4434 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5325
H4504 (Replaced by) 2022-11-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1871 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1842 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4434 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5325
H4504 (Replaced by) 2022-11-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1720 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1720.pdf |