MA H4504 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1720
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing penalties for hit and runs with recreational vehicles in the Commonwealth to be known as the James Ward Act
Title
Increasing penalties for hit and runs with recreational vehicles in the Commonwealth to be known as the James Ward Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-11-02 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-01 | House | New draft of H1720 |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1720 (Replaces) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4504
H2523 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H1871 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1842 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4434 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5325
H2523 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H1871 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1842 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4434 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5325
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4504 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4504.pdf |