MA S2253 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to assist cities and towns with electric vehicle charging infrastructure. Transportation.
Title
To assist cities and towns with electric vehicle charging infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 29, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S42 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S2978
H3893 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4010 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2021
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H3393 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1324 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H4807 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Reported by H5065
S2254 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3003 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H2675 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S42 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S2978
H3893 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4010 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2021
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H3393 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1324 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H4807 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Reported by H5065
S2254 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3003 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H2675 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2253 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2253.pdf |