MA S2252 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S245
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the administration of diabetes medication,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2252).
Title
Relative to the administration of diabetes medication
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-12 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2016-04-28 | Senate | New draft of S245 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S245 (Replaces) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2252
S1204 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1201 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1811 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S369 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
S801 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1204 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1201 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1811 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S369 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
S801 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2252 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2252.pdf |