MA S2251 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 31 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 31 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Deputy Fire Chief of the town of Rutland. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Deputy Fire Chief of the town of Rutland
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-10-31 | House | Enacted |
2019-10-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-09-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-09-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-06-13 | House | House concurred |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2241 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1517 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 20 of the Acts of 2019
H4049 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4824
S1517 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 20 of the Acts of 2019
H4049 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4824
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2251 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2251.pdf |