MA S2219 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1656
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the department of capital asset management and maintenance to lease certain land in the town of Hull to The Friends of the Paragon Carousel, Inc.,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2219).
Title
Authorizing the department of capital asset management and maintenance to lease certain land in the town of Hull to The Friends of the Paragon Carousel, Inc
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #532 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2016-07-30 | House | Enacted 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 462) |
2016-07-30 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-28 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-07-26 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-26 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2016-04-11 | Senate | New draft of S1656 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1656 (Replaces) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2219
S1579 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1884 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2051 (Similar To) 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2016
H3320 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
S1579 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1884 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2051 (Similar To) 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2016
H3320 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2219 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2219.pdf |