MA S2208 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2657

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to fund the transition to electric vehicles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding the transition to electric vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2657
2023-09-22JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2657 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3904 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2442 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3823 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4573
H3845 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
S2731 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback