MA S2208 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2490

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the scheduling of employees. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the scheduling of employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2490
2017-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2017-11-08HouseHouse concurred
2017-11-01SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2017-11-01SenateRules suspended
2017-09-21SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback