MA S2204 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2715
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to utility meters and the rights of utility ratepayers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to smart meters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2715 |
2021-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2204 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2204.pdf |