MA S2193 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2715
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further our commitment to non-carbon emitting energy sources. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Furthering our commitment to non-carbon emitting energy sources
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2715 |
2021-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2014 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2708
H3361 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2144 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3321 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3285 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2014 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2708
H3361 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2144 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3321 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3285 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2193 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2193.pdf |