MA S2182 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Report of the Massachusetts Capital Resource Company (under the provisions of Section 20 of Chapter 816 of the Acts of 1977) submitting its forty-second annual report
Title
Massachusetts Capital Resource Company Annual Report
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed on file |
2019-03-11 | House | House concurred |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2182 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2182.pdf |