MA S218 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 140 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 140 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to maintain short term objectives for students with disabilities. Education.
Title
To maintain short-term objectives for students with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 140 of the Acts of 2013 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-11-13 | House | Enacted |
2013-11-13 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-10-10 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed), and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S218 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S218.pdf |