MA S2154 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Moore, a petition of Michael O. Moore that provisions be made for an investigation and study by a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study energy rate procurement related to investor-owned utilities and consumer relief. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve establishing a commission to study energy rate procurement related to investor-owned utilities and consumer relief

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-10HouseHouse concurred
2024-05-22SenateReporting date extended to Thursday, June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-03HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-28SenateReporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-05-31JointHearing scheduled for 06/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2688 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4562 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2728 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4753 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Senate concurred
S2833 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback