MA S2688 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 9:00 am in Written Testimony Only
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 9:00 am in Written Testimony Only
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to properly recognize merchant marine veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
To properly recognize merchant marine veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-04-24 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4152 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
S2314 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H4152 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
S2314 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2688 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2688.pdf |