MA S2135 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a moratorium on new gas system expansion. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a moratorium on new gas system expansion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2023-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-06-06JointHearing scheduled for 07/27/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1979 (Similar To) 2024-05-21 - Senate concurred
H1795 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H3238 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H3237 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback