MA S2083 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Leonard DeMauro, an employee of the Department of Youth Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Leonard DeMauro, an employee of the Department of Youth Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-04-03 | House | House concurred |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Rule 20 and Joint Rule 12 suspended |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2083 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2083.pdf |