MA S2064 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to define zone 1 in the MBTA commuter rail system. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to defining zone 1 in the MBTA commuter rail system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S1190 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S2104 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1351 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3018 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2102 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2052 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2082 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback