MA H3018 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a pilot program for the payment of parking fees at certain commuter rail stations. Transportation.
Title
Establishing a pilot program allowing for in-person payment of daily parking fees at certain commuter rail stations operated by the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3061 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2964 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3021 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2064 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2073 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H2759 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3934 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3061 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2964 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3021 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2064 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2073 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H2759 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3934 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3018 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3018.pdf |