MA S2063 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4771
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to update the Open Meeting Law to support remote participation. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Updating the Open Meeting Law to support remote participation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4771 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S804 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
S2065 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4030 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4771
H4771 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2065 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4030 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4771
H4771 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2063 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2063.pdf |