MA S804 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen the management of the health care connector. Health Care Financing.
Title
To strengthen the management of the health care connector
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4133 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2724 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4545 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2724 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4545 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S804 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S804.pdf |