MA S2055 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5031
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to permit enhanced public access to deliberations of public bodies and to permit improved efficiency of public bodies. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To permit enhanced public access to deliberations of public bodies and to permit improved efficiency of public bodies
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H5031 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3227 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S359 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H596
S1124 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4715
H5031 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3224 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S359 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H596
S1124 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4715
H5031 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3224 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2055 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2055.pdf |