MA S2053 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a moratorium on the procurement of structures or activities generating PFAS emissions. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing a moratorium on the procurement of structures or activities generating PFAS emissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2023-11-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1795 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H3238 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2821 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H3238 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2821 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2053 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2053.pdf |