MA S2043 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 486 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 486 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge in the town of Barre as the Basil D. Izzi Bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the town of Barre as the U.S.N. S2/C Basil D. Izzi Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 486 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-06-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Transportation |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2014-03-12 | House | House concurred |
2013-11-27 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Transportation |
2013-11-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2043 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2043.pdf |