MA S2030 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a jail and prison construction moratorium. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing a jail and prison construction moratorium
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S297 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H568 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
S952 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1717 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1905 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5173
H568 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
S952 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1717 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1905 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5173
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2030 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2030.pdf |