MA S2026 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to validate the actions taken at the annual town election in the town of Hampden
Title
Validating the actions taken at the annual town election in the town of Hampden
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 180 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-11-15 | House | Enacted |
2011-11-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2011-10-24 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-10-03 | House | House concurred |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2026 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17408&generalCourtId=1 |